THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:09:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 102-480 Huronia Rd
Barrie ON L4N 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7077920933
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services
111 St Regis Crescent South
North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: 416 398 0638
Date Received: 21 Mar 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trudy C. McNabb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. McNabb (CPSO#: 53992 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 102-480 Huronia Rd
Barrie ON L4N 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7077920933
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services
111 St Regis Crescent South
North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: 416 398 0638
Date Received: 21 Mar 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trudy C. McNabb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. McNabb (CPSO#: 53992 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TRUDY CHRISTINA MCNABB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNABB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TRUDY CHRISTINA MCNABB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNABB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984