THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:13:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4949 Bathurst Street
Suite 212
Toronto Ontario M2R 1Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 6334984
Fax: 416 633 4446

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Franklin W. Sheps Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Sheps (CPSO#: 54000 )
Business Address: 212 - 4949 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M2R 1Y1
(416) 633-4984

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4949 Bathurst Street
Suite 212
Toronto Ontario M2R 1Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 6334984
Fax: 416 633 4446

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Franklin W. Sheps Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Sheps (CPSO#: 54000 )
Business Address: 212 - 4949 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M2R 1Y1
(416) 633-4984

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANKLIN WILLIAM SHEPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEPS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANKLIN WILLIAM SHEPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEPS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984