THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:34:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1953 Weston Road
Weston Ontario M9N 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 248-5539
Fax: (416) 248-0520

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Costaris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. a. costaris (CPSO#: 54032 )
Business Address: 1953 Weston Road
Weston Ontario M9N 1W8
(416) 248-5539

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1953 Weston Road
Weston Ontario M9N 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 248-5539
Fax: (416) 248-0520

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Costaris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. a. costaris (CPSO#: 54032 )
Business Address: 1953 Weston Road
Weston Ontario M9N 1W8
(416) 248-5539

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELOS COSTARIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSTARIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELOS COSTARIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSTARIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984