THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:52:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-291-7719
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Medcan Clinic
National Bank Building
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto Ontario M5H 3S5
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jan 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 18 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janice M. Weiss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Weiss (CPSO#: 54034 )
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Business Address: 1500 - 150 York Street
Toronto Ontario M5H 3S5
(416) 350-5900
Business Address: Malvern Medical Centre
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Y9
(416) 291-7719

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-291-7719
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Medcan Clinic
National Bank Building
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto Ontario M5H 3S5
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jan 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 18 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janice M. Weiss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Weiss (CPSO#: 54034 )
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Business Address: 1500 - 150 York Street
Toronto Ontario M5H 3S5
(416) 350-5900
Business Address: Malvern Medical Centre
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Y9
(416) 291-7719

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANICE MARLA WEISS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANICE MARLA WEISS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984