THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:53:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 355 Eglinton Avenue East
3rd Floor
Toronto Ontario M4P 1M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 277-8361
Fax: (647) 800-6758

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 May 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Casola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Casola (CPSO#: 54052 )
Business Address: 3rd Floor
355 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 1M5
(416) 277-8361

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 355 Eglinton Avenue East
3rd Floor
Toronto Ontario M4P 1M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 277-8361
Fax: (647) 800-6758

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 May 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Casola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Casola (CPSO#: 54052 )
Business Address: 3rd Floor
355 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 1M5
(416) 277-8361

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL GERARD CASOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASOLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL GERARD CASOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASOLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984