THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:14:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Health Network
Eaton Wing 1ES-416
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 8562
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 29 May 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Hendler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hendler (CPSO#: 54063 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 6-201
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 8562
Business Address: University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 1-ES-416
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 8562

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Health Network
Eaton Wing 1ES-416
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 8562
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 29 May 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Hendler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hendler (CPSO#: 54063 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 6-201
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 8562
Business Address: University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 1-ES-416
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 8562

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON LLOYD HENDLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON LLOYD HENDLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984