THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 23:41:52 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 13 Gore Street
Perth Ontario K7H 2L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 264-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 28 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas Paul Morell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Morell (CPSO#: 54072 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 13 Gore Street
Perth Ontario K7H 2L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 264-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 28 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas Paul Morell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Morell (CPSO#: 54072 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS PAUL MORELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS PAUL MORELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1984