THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:28:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Room C9-116
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3307
Fax: (519) 663-3043

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 21 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Schemitsch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Schemitsch (CPSO#: 54083 )
Business Address: LHSC University Hospital
Room C9-116
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3349

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Room C9-116
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3307
Fax: (519) 663-3043

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 21 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Schemitsch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Schemitsch (CPSO#: 54083 )
Business Address: LHSC University Hospital
Room C9-116
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3349

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMIL HARALD SCHEMITSCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHEMITSCH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMIL HARALD SCHEMITSCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHEMITSCH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1986

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984