THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:19:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 220-63 Algoma St N
Thunder Bay ON P7A 4Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-683-4411
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 May 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Franczyk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Franczyk (CPSO#: 54085 )
Business Address: Medical Arts X-Ray
Suite 101
270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2V4
(705) 743-7810
Business Address: The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
(705) 743-6222
Business Address: The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
(705) 743-2040
Business Address: Pine Ridge X-Ray
555 George Street North
Peterborough Ontario K9H 3S1
(705) 745-1058
Business Address: Turnbull Diagnostic Imaging
170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough Ontario K9H 2H7
(705) 742-1058

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 220-63 Algoma St N
Thunder Bay ON P7A 4Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-683-4411
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 May 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Franczyk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Franczyk (CPSO#: 54085 )
Business Address: Medical Arts X-Ray
Suite 101
270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2V4
(705) 743-7810
Business Address: The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
(705) 743-6222
Business Address: The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
(705) 743-2040
Business Address: Pine Ridge X-Ray
555 George Street North
Peterborough Ontario K9H 3S1
(705) 745-1058
Business Address: Turnbull Diagnostic Imaging
170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough Ontario K9H 2H7
(705) 742-1058

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIET AGNES ELISABETH FRANCZYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANCZYK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIET AGNES ELISABETH FRANCZYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANCZYK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984