THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:45:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2772 Danforth Avenue
Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M4C 1L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 699-8105
Fax: (416) 699-3273

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Mark Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mark (CPSO#: 54094 )
Business Address: 2772 Danforth Avenue
Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M4C 1L7
(416) 699-8105

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2772 Danforth Avenue
Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M4C 1L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 699-8105
Fax: (416) 699-3273

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Mark Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mark (CPSO#: 54094 )
Business Address: 2772 Danforth Avenue
Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M4C 1L7
(416) 699-8105

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAMELA ALISON MARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAMELA ALISON MARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984