THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:22:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Box 1087
Harrow Ontario N0R 1G0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199956182
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachel C. Park Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Park (CPSO#: 54097 )
Business Address: 197 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N8
(519) 322-1100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Box 1087
Harrow Ontario N0R 1G0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199956182
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachel C. Park Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Park (CPSO#: 54097 )
Business Address: 197 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N8
(519) 322-1100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL CAROL PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL CAROL PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984