THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:51:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Main Floor
1290 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6H 1N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 537-7000
Fax: (416) 537-0132

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Irwin J. Asbell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Asbell (CPSO#: 54106 )
Business Address: Main Floor
1290 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6H 1N9
(416) 537-7000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Main Floor
1290 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6H 1N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 537-7000
Fax: (416) 537-0132

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Irwin J. Asbell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Asbell (CPSO#: 54106 )
Business Address: Main Floor
1290 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6H 1N9
(416) 537-7000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRWIN JOSEPH ASBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASBELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRWIN JOSEPH ASBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASBELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984