THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:38:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 08 Sep 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ronald Goldenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Goldenberg (CPSO#: 54128 )
Business Address: 5 - 1600 Steeles Avenue West
Vaughan Ontario L4K 4M2
(905) 763-8660
Business Address: 2 Woodthrush Crt
North York ON M2K 2B1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 08 Sep 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ronald Goldenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Goldenberg (CPSO#: 54128 )
Business Address: 5 - 1600 Steeles Avenue West
Vaughan Ontario L4K 4M2
(905) 763-8660
Business Address: 2 Woodthrush Crt
North York ON M2K 2B1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONALD MICHAEL GOLDENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDENBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONALD MICHAEL GOLDENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDENBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984