THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:13:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 302
412 Johnson Street
Niagara-on-the-Lake ON L0S 1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-341-3249
Fax: 905-468-1693

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Ready Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ready (CPSO#: 54137 )
Business Address: PO Box 302
412 Johnson Street
Niagara on the Lake ON L0S 1J0
705-341-3249

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 302
412 Johnson Street
Niagara-on-the-Lake ON L0S 1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-341-3249
Fax: 905-468-1693

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Ready Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ready (CPSO#: 54137 )
Business Address: PO Box 302
412 Johnson Street
Niagara on the Lake ON L0S 1J0
705-341-3249

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC THOMAS READY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. READY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC THOMAS READY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. READY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1984