THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:17:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058951361
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 22 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Thomas Bertoia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bertoia (CPSO#: 54173 )
Business Address: South Lake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Address: 596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
9058951361

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058951361
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 22 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Thomas Bertoia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bertoia (CPSO#: 54173 )
Business Address: South Lake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Address: 596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
9058951361

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN THOMAS DOUGLAS BERTOIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERTOIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN THOMAS DOUGLAS BERTOIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERTOIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984