THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:55:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 1973
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 24 Duncairn Road
Don Mills Ontario M3B 1C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 447-9398
Fax: (416) 447-1756

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 22 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martens-Kmiotek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Martens-Kmiotek (CPSO#: 54179 )
Business Address: 24 Duncairn Road
Side Entrance
Don Mills Ontario M3B 1C8
(416) 447-9398

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 24 Duncairn Road
Don Mills Ontario M3B 1C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 447-9398
Fax: (416) 447-1756

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 22 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martens-Kmiotek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Martens-Kmiotek (CPSO#: 54179 )
Business Address: 24 Duncairn Road
Side Entrance
Don Mills Ontario M3B 1C8
(416) 447-9398

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EWA LIDIA MARTENS-KMIOTEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTENS-KMIOTEK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EWA LIDIA MARTENS-KMIOTEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTENS-KMIOTEK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984