THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:48:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 491 Eglinton Avenue West
2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 782-6111
Fax: (416) 782-5515

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abells Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Abells (CPSO#: 54193 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 491 Eglinton Avenue West
2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 782-6111
Fax: (416) 782-5515

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abells Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Abells (CPSO#: 54193 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOEL BARUCH ABELLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABELLS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOEL BARUCH ABELLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABELLS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984