THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:58:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Suite 104
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 789-2355
Fax: (705) 789-1051

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Rea Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rea (CPSO#: 54203 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Suite 104
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 789-2355
Fax: (705) 789-1051

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Rea Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rea (CPSO#: 54203 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN COATES REA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN COATES REA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1984