THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 08:02:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: SaveSight Vision Centre
Suite 106
345 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 1L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 371-1930
Fax: (519) 371-8634

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.H. Lukasik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lukasik (CPSO#: 54237 )
Business Address: Suite 106
345 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 1L3
(519) 371-1700

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: SaveSight Vision Centre
Suite 106
345 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 1L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 371-1930
Fax: (519) 371-8634

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.H. Lukasik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lukasik (CPSO#: 54237 )
Business Address: Suite 106
345 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 1L3
(519) 371-1700

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK HENRY LUKASIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKASIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK HENRY LUKASIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKASIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1984