THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:35:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University
1200 Main Street West
Room 4E16
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 73222
Fax: (905) 521-9992
Address: University Health Network
Cambridge Site
Unit 101
745 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R 0B6
Phone: 519-622-5885
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St John's Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Bain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bain (CPSO#: 54242 )
Business Address: 2552 Britannia Rd
Burlington ON L7P 0G3

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Bain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Aug 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University
1200 Main Street West
Room 4E16
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 73222
Fax: (905) 521-9992
Address: University Health Network
Cambridge Site
Unit 101
745 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R 0B6
Phone: 519-622-5885
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St John's Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Bain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bain (CPSO#: 54242 )
Business Address: 2552 Britannia Rd
Burlington ON L7P 0G3

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Bain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Aug 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES RALPH BAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES RALPH BAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984