THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:02:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Room 535A
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Extension: 82580
Fax: (613) 738-8337

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 07 Sep 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin D. Burns Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Burns (CPSO#: 54263 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus
Suite 535
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 738-8400 Extn: 82580

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Room 535A
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Extension: 82580
Fax: (613) 738-8337

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 07 Sep 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin D. Burns Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Burns (CPSO#: 54263 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus
Suite 535
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 738-8400 Extn: 82580

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN DONALD BURNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURNS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN DONALD BURNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURNS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1984