THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:31:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department Of Surgery
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-2951
Fax: (905) 521-6113

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 20 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehran Anvari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Anvari (CPSO#: 54438 )
Business Address: St Josephs Hospital
Department of Surgery
Suite G805
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-2951

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department Of Surgery
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-2951
Fax: (905) 521-6113

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 20 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehran Anvari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Anvari (CPSO#: 54438 )
Business Address: St Josephs Hospital
Department of Surgery
Suite G805
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-2951

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEHRAN ANVARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANVARI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEHRAN ANVARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANVARI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984