THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:26:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 89 Queensway West
MLHC
214
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058486079
Fax: 9058588835
Address: 150 Sherway Dr.
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
Phone: (416) 521-4196
Fax: 416 521 4082

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 09 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 05 Sep 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Ostrowska Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ostrowska (CPSO#: 54452 )
Business Address: 89 Queensway West
suite 214
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
905848 6079

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 89 Queensway West
MLHC
214
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058486079
Fax: 9058588835
Address: 150 Sherway Dr.
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
Phone: (416) 521-4196
Fax: 416 521 4082

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 09 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 05 Sep 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Ostrowska Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ostrowska (CPSO#: 54452 )
Business Address: 89 Queensway West
suite 214
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
905848 6079

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRYSTYNA IRENA OSTROWSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSTROWSKA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRYSTYNA IRENA OSTROWSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSTROWSKA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984