THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:09:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit D
210 Martindale Road
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 346-0170
Fax: (905) 346-0338

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 03 Sep 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Soliman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Soliman (CPSO#: 54506 )
Business Address: Unit D
210 Martindale Road
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0B2
(905) 346-0170

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit D
210 Martindale Road
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 346-0170
Fax: (905) 346-0338

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 03 Sep 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Soliman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Soliman (CPSO#: 54506 )
Business Address: Unit D
210 Martindale Road
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0B2
(905) 346-0170

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GAMAL MIKHAIL LABIB SOLIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLIMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GAMAL MIKHAIL LABIB SOLIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLIMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 1992

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984