THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:17:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Extension: 6366
Fax: (613) 798-2992

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 May 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Brockville Mental Health Centre
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bourget Labelle Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Labelle (CPSO#: 54528 ) Dr. D. Bourget (CPSO#: 54525 )
Business Address: Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Extension: 6366
Fax: (613) 798-2992

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 May 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Brockville Mental Health Centre
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bourget Labelle Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Labelle (CPSO#: 54528 ) Dr. D. Bourget (CPSO#: 54525 )
Business Address: Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOMINIQUE BOURGET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURGET is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOMINIQUE BOURGET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURGET is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984