THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:46:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CAMH
100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 9467810
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 27 King's College Circle
Room 225
Toronto Ontario M5S 1A1
Phone: 4169786159
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 08 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Trevor Young Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Young (CPSO#: 54575 )
Business Address: CAMH
100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 535-8501

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CAMH
100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 9467810
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 27 King's College Circle
Room 225
Toronto Ontario M5S 1A1
Phone: 4169786159
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 08 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Trevor Young Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Young (CPSO#: 54575 )
Business Address: CAMH
100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 535-8501

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIONEL TREVOR YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIONEL TREVOR YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 29 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984