THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:44:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Maple Clinic
1036 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 546-9721
Fax: (613) 546-2799

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Sangster-Gibson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sangster-Gibson (CPSO#: 54580 )
Business Address: D2 - 1036 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1H2
(613) 546-2802

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Maple Clinic
1036 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 546-9721
Fax: (613) 546-2799

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Sangster-Gibson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sangster-Gibson (CPSO#: 54580 )
Business Address: D2 - 1036 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1H2
(613) 546-2802

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN ISABEL SANGSTER-GIBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANGSTER-GIBSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN ISABEL SANGSTER-GIBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANGSTER-GIBSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984