THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:54:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
4N 468
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4928
Fax: (416) 340-5069

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 24 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 11 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 11 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: dr robert james medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Cusimano (CPSO#: 54600 )
Business Address: 468-200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
4163404928

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert James Cusimano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Feb 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
4N 468
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4928
Fax: (416) 340-5069

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 24 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 11 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 11 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: dr robert james medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Cusimano (CPSO#: 54600 )
Business Address: 468-200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
4163404928

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert James Cusimano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Feb 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES CUSIMANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUSIMANO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES CUSIMANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUSIMANO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1984
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1984