THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:30:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1973
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 37 Thorncliff Place
Nepean Ontario K2H 6L5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 596-1993
Fax: (613) 596-6764

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 16 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanna M. Morawska-Jablonska Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Morawska-Jablonska (CPSO#: 54644 )
Business Address: 37 Thorncliff Place
Nepean Ontario K2H 6L5
(613) 596-1993

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 37 Thorncliff Place
Nepean Ontario K2H 6L5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 596-1993
Fax: (613) 596-6764

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 16 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanna M. Morawska-Jablonska Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Morawska-Jablonska (CPSO#: 54644 )
Business Address: 37 Thorncliff Place
Nepean Ontario K2H 6L5
(613) 596-1993

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNA MARIA MORAWSKA-JABLONSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORAWSKA-JABLONSKA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNA MARIA MORAWSKA-JABLONSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORAWSKA-JABLONSKA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984