THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:29:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Punjabi University, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 900 Ray Lawson Boulevard
Unit 5
Brampton Ontario L6Y 5H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 452-0026
Fax: (905) 452-1974

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rakesh Uppal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Uppal (CPSO#: 54659 )
Business Address: Suite 5
900 Ray Lawson Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6Y 5H7
(905) 452-0026

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Punjabi University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 900 Ray Lawson Boulevard
Unit 5
Brampton Ontario L6Y 5H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 452-0026
Fax: (905) 452-1974

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rakesh Uppal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Uppal (CPSO#: 54659 )
Business Address: Suite 5
900 Ray Lawson Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6Y 5H7
(905) 452-0026

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAKESH UPPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UPPAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAKESH UPPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UPPAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Punjabi University, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 1986

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984