THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:25:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peel Regional Cancer Clinic
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-1100
Extension: 5000
Fax: (905) 813-3962

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Radwan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Radwan (CPSO#: 54699 )
Business Address: 1100 Eglinton Avenue East
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1N5
Business Address: 1100 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5V

Corporation Name: John Radwan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Feb 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peel Regional Cancer Clinic
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-1100
Extension: 5000
Fax: (905) 813-3962

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Radwan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Radwan (CPSO#: 54699 )
Business Address: 1100 Eglinton Avenue East
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1N5
Business Address: 1100 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5V

Corporation Name: John Radwan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Feb 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN STEPHEN RADWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADWAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN STEPHEN RADWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADWAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Apr 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1985

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 1981