THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:38:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Pathology
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7297
Fax: (905) 848-8313
Address: 30 Bond Street
Department of Pathology
Toronto
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 11 Dec 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Pathology
Effective: 09 Dec 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Claire I. Coire Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Coire (CPSO#: 54720 )
Business Address: Department of Pathology
Trillium Health Centre
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7297

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Pathology
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7297
Fax: (905) 848-8313
Address: 30 Bond Street
Department of Pathology
Toronto
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 11 Dec 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Pathology
Effective: 09 Dec 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Claire I. Coire Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Coire (CPSO#: 54720 )
Business Address: Department of Pathology
Trillium Health Centre
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7297

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLAIRE ISABELLE COIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COIRE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLAIRE ISABELLE COIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COIRE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984