THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:53:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Agra University, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 101-135 Queens Plate Drive
Toronto Ontario M9W 6V1
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 905-638-2000
Extension: 2
Fax: 905-793-9323

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Reen (CPSO#: 54890 )
Business Address: 215 Delta Park Blvd
Unit 08
Brampton ON L6T 0H9
905-638-2000 Extn: 1
Business Address: Suite 101
3 Conestoga Drive
Brampton Ontario L6Z 4N5
(905) 453-0715

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Agra University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 101-135 Queens Plate Drive
Toronto Ontario M9W 6V1
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 905-638-2000
Extension: 2
Fax: 905-793-9323

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Reen (CPSO#: 54890 )
Business Address: 215 Delta Park Blvd
Unit 08
Brampton ON L6T 0H9
905-638-2000 Extn: 1
Business Address: Suite 101
3 Conestoga Drive
Brampton Ontario L6Z 4N5
(905) 453-0715

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BAJINDER SINGH REEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BAJINDER SINGH REEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Agra University, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2000

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 1995
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 1984