THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:56:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: True North Imaging
120 - 7330 Yonge St
Thornhill Ontario L4J 7Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 707-1777
Fax: (905) 707-0616

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 29 May 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Isaacson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Isaacson (CPSO#: 55070 )
Business Address: True North Imaging
Victoria/Kitchener Ultrasound Mammography & X-Ray
Suite B2
751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N4
Business Address: Meadowvale Boulevard Imaging
2180 Meadowvale Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5N 5S3
Business Address: True North Imaging
Markham Reproductive Imaging
Suite 305
377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Business Address: True North Imaging
Markham Women's Imaging
Unit 1
39 Main Street North
Markham Ontario L3P 1X3
Business Address: True North Imaging
Franklin X-Ray & Ultrasound
Suite 101
1150 Franklin Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7J2
Business Address: True North Imaging
North Toronto Diagnostic Imaging St. Clair
2938 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1W 2T4
Business Address: True North Imaging Waterloo X-Ray & Ultrasound
65 University Avenue East
Waterloo Ontario N2J 2V9
Business Address: Oakville Diagnostic Imaging
2035 Cornwall Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 7S2
Business Address: True North Imaging
Etobicoke Women's Imaging
Unit 1-4
110 Queen`s Plate Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 0B4
Business Address: True North Imaging
Suite 120
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 7Y7
Business Address: Mobile Ultrasound
65 Univeristy Avenue East
Waterloo Ontario N2J 2V9
Business Address: True North Imaging
Thornhill Diagnostic Imaging
Suite 206
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 1V8
Business Address: True North Imaging
Fairway X-Ray & Ultrasound
385 Fairway Road South
Kitchener Ontario N2C 1X2
Business Address: True North Imaging
Toronto West Ultrasound
1560 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6R 1A6
Business Address: Grandview X-Ray & Ultrasound
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3H7
Business Address: True North Imaging Canamera X-Ray & Ultrasound
Suite B9
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7L7
Business Address: True North Imaging
MidTown Diagnostic Imaging
Lower Level - Room 6
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
Business Address: Sheppard Ultrasound
Unit 5 & 6
1780 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 2W2
Business Address: Markham Mammography
39 Main Street North
Markham Ontario L3P 1X3
Business Address: Bloor East Ultrasound
15th Floor
160 Bloor Street East
Toronto Ontario M4W 3R2
Business Address: Suite 317
Kennedy Road Ultrasound
2330 Kennedy Road
Scarborough Ontario M1T 0A2
Business Address: True North Imaging
Reproductive Imaging
18th Floor
655 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2K4
Business Address: North York Ultrasound
4025 Yonge Street
Suite 215
Toronto Ontario M2P 2E3
(416) 299-6887

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: True North Imaging
120 - 7330 Yonge St
Thornhill Ontario L4J 7Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 707-1777
Fax: (905) 707-0616

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 29 May 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Isaacson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Isaacson (CPSO#: 55070 )
Business Address: True North Imaging
Victoria/Kitchener Ultrasound Mammography & X-Ray
Suite B2
751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N4
Business Address: Meadowvale Boulevard Imaging
2180 Meadowvale Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5N 5S3
Business Address: True North Imaging
Markham Reproductive Imaging
Suite 305
377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Business Address: True North Imaging
Markham Women's Imaging
Unit 1
39 Main Street North
Markham Ontario L3P 1X3
Business Address: True North Imaging
Franklin X-Ray & Ultrasound
Suite 101
1150 Franklin Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7J2
Business Address: True North Imaging
North Toronto Diagnostic Imaging St. Clair
2938 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1W 2T4
Business Address: True North Imaging Waterloo X-Ray & Ultrasound
65 University Avenue East
Waterloo Ontario N2J 2V9
Business Address: Oakville Diagnostic Imaging
2035 Cornwall Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 7S2
Business Address: True North Imaging
Etobicoke Women's Imaging
Unit 1-4
110 Queen`s Plate Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 0B4
Business Address: True North Imaging
Suite 120
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 7Y7
Business Address: Mobile Ultrasound
65 Univeristy Avenue East
Waterloo Ontario N2J 2V9
Business Address: True North Imaging
Thornhill Diagnostic Imaging
Suite 206
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 1V8
Business Address: True North Imaging
Fairway X-Ray & Ultrasound
385 Fairway Road South
Kitchener Ontario N2C 1X2
Business Address: True North Imaging
Toronto West Ultrasound
1560 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6R 1A6
Business Address: Grandview X-Ray & Ultrasound
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3H7
Business Address: True North Imaging Canamera X-Ray & Ultrasound
Suite B9
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7L7
Business Address: True North Imaging
MidTown Diagnostic Imaging
Lower Level - Room 6
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
Business Address: Sheppard Ultrasound
Unit 5 & 6
1780 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 2W2
Business Address: Markham Mammography
39 Main Street North
Markham Ontario L3P 1X3
Business Address: Bloor East Ultrasound
15th Floor
160 Bloor Street East
Toronto Ontario M4W 3R2
Business Address: Suite 317
Kennedy Road Ultrasound
2330 Kennedy Road
Scarborough Ontario M1T 0A2
Business Address: True North Imaging
Reproductive Imaging
18th Floor
655 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2K4
Business Address: North York Ultrasound
4025 Yonge Street
Suite 215
Toronto Ontario M2P 2E3
(416) 299-6887

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN ISAACSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISAACSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN ISAACSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISAACSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 1985