THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:56:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
3 M C 428
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5800
Extension: 2583
Fax: (416) 603-4257

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Roger M.L. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Smith (CPSO#: 55101 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
3MC-428
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800

Corporation Name: Dr. Roger Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Jun 2017

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
3 M C 428
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5800
Extension: 2583
Fax: (416) 603-4257

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Roger M.L. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Smith (CPSO#: 55101 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
3MC-428
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800

Corporation Name: Dr. Roger Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Jun 2017

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROGER MACLEOD LAING SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROGER MACLEOD LAING SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 1985