THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:29:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 56 Prospect Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 853-5864
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 01 Sep 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 13 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Toth, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Toth (CPSO#: 55244 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 56 Prospect Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 853-5864
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 01 Sep 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 13 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Toth, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Toth (CPSO#: 55244 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIUS LLOYD ROY TOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOTH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIUS LLOYD ROY TOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOTH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 May 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 May 1985