THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:43:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 500
871 Ottawa Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 2C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-4833
Fax: (519) 254-3692

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 24 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jude Rodrigues Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rodrigues (CPSO#: 55259 )
Business Address: Suite 500
871 Ottawa Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 2C9
(519) 254-4833

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 500
871 Ottawa Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 2C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-4833
Fax: (519) 254-3692

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 24 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jude Rodrigues Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rodrigues (CPSO#: 55259 )
Business Address: Suite 500
871 Ottawa Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 2C9
(519) 254-4833

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUDE FRANCIS NOEL RODRIGUES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODRIGUES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUDE FRANCIS NOEL RODRIGUES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODRIGUES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Bombay, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 1985
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 May 1985