THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:22:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1359 Pebble Rd
Ottawa ON K1V 7R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138524039
Fax: 6137072190

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 29 May 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. J. Vervaeke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Vervaeke (CPSO#: 55278 )
Business Address: 1359 Pebble Rd
Ottawa ON K1V 7R7
6138524039
Business Address: Suite 316
1385 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8N4
(613) 728-5672

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1359 Pebble Rd
Ottawa ON K1V 7R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138524039
Fax: 6137072190

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 29 May 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. J. Vervaeke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Vervaeke (CPSO#: 55278 )
Business Address: 1359 Pebble Rd
Ottawa ON K1V 7R7
6138524039
Business Address: Suite 316
1385 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8N4
(613) 728-5672

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JOSEPH VERVAEKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERVAEKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JOSEPH VERVAEKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERVAEKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985