THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:42:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 801 King Edward Ave
Ottawa ON K1N 6N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-562-5498
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Ehrlich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ehrlich (CPSO#: 55329 )
Business Address: 75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
(613) 241-3344
Business Address: 801 King Edward Ave
University of Ottawa
Student Health & Wellness Centre
Ottawa Ontario K1N 6N5
613 562 5498
Business Address: 60 Springhurst Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 5V7
613-979-5282

Corporation Name: H. Ehrlich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Mar 2015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 801 King Edward Ave
Ottawa ON K1N 6N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-562-5498
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Ehrlich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ehrlich (CPSO#: 55329 )
Business Address: 75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
(613) 241-3344
Business Address: 801 King Edward Ave
University of Ottawa
Student Health & Wellness Centre
Ottawa Ontario K1N 6N5
613 562 5498
Business Address: 60 Springhurst Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 5V7
613-979-5282

Corporation Name: H. Ehrlich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Mar 2015

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELGA KATHARINA EHRLICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EHRLICH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELGA KATHARINA EHRLICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EHRLICH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 1988

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985