THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:38:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
McMaster University Medical Centre
Room 4E2
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75231
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford General Hospital
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Phone: 519-752-7871
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric General Surgery
Effective: 26 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 26 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Fitzgerald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Fitzgerald (CPSO#: 55332 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 521-4941
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
Suite 4E2
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue East
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford General Hospital
Surgery
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
519-752-7871

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
McMaster University Medical Centre
Room 4E2
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75231
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford General Hospital
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Phone: 519-752-7871
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric General Surgery
Effective: 26 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 26 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Fitzgerald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Fitzgerald (CPSO#: 55332 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 521-4941
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
Suite 4E2
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue East
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford General Hospital
Surgery
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
519-752-7871

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER GREGORY FITZGERALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FITZGERALD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER GREGORY FITZGERALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FITZGERALD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985