THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:01:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ron Joyce Children's Health Centre
325 Wellington Street., North
CYMHP - Level 3
Hamilton Ontario L8L 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 77294
Fax: (905) 521-7968

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 29 May 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lipman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lipman (CPSO#: 55343 )
Business Address: Ron Joyce Children's Health Centre
325 Wellington Street North
CYMHP - Level 3
Hamilton Ontario L8L 0A4
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 77294

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ron Joyce Children's Health Centre
325 Wellington Street., North
CYMHP - Level 3
Hamilton Ontario L8L 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 77294
Fax: (905) 521-7968

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 29 May 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lipman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lipman (CPSO#: 55343 )
Business Address: Ron Joyce Children's Health Centre
325 Wellington Street North
CYMHP - Level 3
Hamilton Ontario L8L 0A4
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 77294

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELLEN LOUISE LIPMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELLEN LOUISE LIPMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 1985