THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:51:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 Saint Thomas St
Toronto ON M5S 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 969 3250
Fax: 437 317 9601
Address: 333 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5H 2R2
Phone: 4163643008
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Rubino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rubino (CPSO#: 55356 )
Business Address: 1240 Bay Street
Suite 900B
Toronto Ontario M5R 2A7
416-971-7601
Business Address: 2 Saint Thomas St
Toronto ON M5S 2Z1
416 969 3250

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 Saint Thomas St
Toronto ON M5S 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 969 3250
Fax: 437 317 9601
Address: 333 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5H 2R2
Phone: 4163643008
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Rubino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rubino (CPSO#: 55356 )
Business Address: 1240 Bay Street
Suite 900B
Toronto Ontario M5R 2A7
416-971-7601
Business Address: 2 Saint Thomas St
Toronto ON M5S 2Z1
416 969 3250

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY RUBINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBINO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY RUBINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBINO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Feb 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Feb 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985