THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:23:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 525 University Ave
Suite 703
Toronto ON M5G 2L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 857 0307
Fax: 416 813 2189
Address: 175 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2G3
Phone: 416-813-2189
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Dundas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dundas (CPSO#: 55369 )
Business Address: 440 Jarvis Street
Toronto Ontario M4Y 2H4
(416) 857-0307
Business Address: 52 Harewood Ave
Scarborough ON M1M 2R3
416-857-0307

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 525 University Ave
Suite 703
Toronto ON M5G 2L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 857 0307
Fax: 416 813 2189
Address: 175 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2G3
Phone: 416-813-2189
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Dundas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dundas (CPSO#: 55369 )
Business Address: 440 Jarvis Street
Toronto Ontario M4Y 2H4
(416) 857-0307
Business Address: 52 Harewood Ave
Scarborough ON M1M 2R3
416-857-0307

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN DORIS DUNDAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNDAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN DORIS DUNDAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNDAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985