THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/05/25 19:26:02 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 247 John Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8N 2C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-529-9779
Fax: 905-972-0400

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.F. Michiels Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Michiels (CPSO#: 55373 )
Business Address: 95 Tollgate Drive
Ancaster Ontario L9G 5C9
(905) 541-8525

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 247 John Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8N 2C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-529-9779
Fax: 905-972-0400

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.F. Michiels Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Michiels (CPSO#: 55373 )
Business Address: 95 Tollgate Drive
Ancaster Ontario L9G 5C9
(905) 541-8525

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN FRANCIS MICHIELS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHIELS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN FRANCIS MICHIELS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHIELS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985