THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:57:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 135 Union Street East
Waterloo Ontario N2J 1C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5195799535
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 14 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanne Willoughby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Willoughby (CPSO#: 55395 )
Business Address: 6103 Wellington Road 7
Elora Ontario N0B 1S0
(519) 846-9964

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 135 Union Street East
Waterloo Ontario N2J 1C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5195799535
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 14 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanne Willoughby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Willoughby (CPSO#: 55395 )
Business Address: 6103 Wellington Road 7
Elora Ontario N0B 1S0
(519) 846-9964

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNE SUSAN WILLOUGHBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLOUGHBY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNE SUSAN WILLOUGHBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLOUGHBY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1985