THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:34:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Alcorn Avenue
Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M4V 3A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 968-0292
Fax: (416) 975-0129

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 29 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tom Crocker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Crocker (CPSO#: 55446 )
Business Address: 202 - 10 Alcorn Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4V 3A9
(416) 968-0292

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Alcorn Avenue
Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M4V 3A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 968-0292
Fax: (416) 975-0129

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 29 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tom Crocker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Crocker (CPSO#: 55446 )
Business Address: 202 - 10 Alcorn Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4V 3A9
(416) 968-0292

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS CHARLES CROCKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROCKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS CHARLES CROCKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROCKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985