THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:10:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20 Wynford Drive
Suite 109
Don Mills Ontario M3C 1J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 445-1206
Fax: (416) 445-1235

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 14 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CHRISTINE ERLICH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Erlich (CPSO#: 55455 )
Business Address: 20 Wynford Dr
Suite 109
North York ON M3C 1J4

Corporation Name: Christine Erlich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20 Wynford Drive
Suite 109
Don Mills Ontario M3C 1J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 445-1206
Fax: (416) 445-1235

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 14 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CHRISTINE ERLICH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Erlich (CPSO#: 55455 )
Business Address: 20 Wynford Dr
Suite 109
North York ON M3C 1J4

Corporation Name: Christine Erlich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARY ERLICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERLICH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARY ERLICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERLICH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 1986

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985