THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:56:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-1223 St Clair Ave W
Toronto ON M6E 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166549993
Fax: 4166543432

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lorne Sokol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sokol (CPSO#: 55503 )
Business Address: 111 - 1649 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M6H 3L9
(416) 654-9993

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-1223 St Clair Ave W
Toronto ON M6E 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166549993
Fax: 4166543432

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lorne Sokol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sokol (CPSO#: 55503 )
Business Address: 111 - 1649 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M6H 3L9
(416) 654-9993

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORNE WAYNE SOKOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOKOL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORNE WAYNE SOKOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOKOL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 16 Nov 2011
Summary of Decision:
On November 16, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Lorne Wayne Sokol committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise.

On or about December 14, 2009, Dr. Sokol pleaded guilty in the Ontario Court of Justice and was found guilty of submitting billings to the Ontario Health Insurance Plan ("OHIP") that did not comply with the requirements of the Schedule of Benefits, thereby committing an offence under the Health Insurance Act, R.S.O. 1990, c. H.6, contrary to section 44(1)(a). The conviction related to the period from approximately March 1, 2003 to February 15, 2007.

In light of submissions made by the parties, and acknowledging that Dr. Sokol had made a significant repayment of the amount owing to the Workplace Safety and Insurance Board and to OHIP, totalling $3,511,356.62, the Court imposed a sentence that included a fine of $25,000.00, plus the victim fine surcharge of $6,250, payable in 7 days.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. The Registrar suspend Dr. Sokol's certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months, to commence at 12:01 a.m. on December 1, 2011.

2. The Registrar impose the following specified terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Sokol's certificate of registration:

a) Dr. Sokol shall, at his own expense, participate in and successfully complete an educational program in ethics approved by the College;

b) For a period of one year, the College may request information from the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (OHIP) and/or the Ministry of Health and Long Term Care in order for the College to monitor Dr. Sokol's OHIP billings and to ensure his compliance with the Health Insurance Act;

c) In order to facilitate the College's monitoring, specified in paragraph 2(b), Dr. Sokol shall execute a Consent in the form attached at Appendix "A" to this Order, and shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and patient charts by a College representative(s) for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order.

3. Dr. Sokol appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

4. Dr. Sokol pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00, within 30 days of the date of this Order. 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 16, 2011

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 16 Nov 2011
Summary of Decision:
On November 16, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Lorne Wayne Sokol committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise.

On or about December 14, 2009, Dr. Sokol pleaded guilty in the Ontario Court of Justice and was found guilty of submitting billings to the Ontario Health Insurance Plan ("OHIP") that did not comply with the requirements of the Schedule of Benefits, thereby committing an offence under the Health Insurance Act, R.S.O. 1990, c. H.6, contrary to section 44(1)(a). The conviction related to the period from approximately March 1, 2003 to February 15, 2007.

In light of submissions made by the parties, and acknowledging that Dr. Sokol had made a significant repayment of the amount owing to the Workplace Safety and Insurance Board and to OHIP, totalling $3,511,356.62, the Court imposed a sentence that included a fine of $25,000.00, plus the victim fine surcharge of $6,250, payable in 7 days.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. The Registrar suspend Dr. Sokol's certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months, to commence at 12:01 a.m. on December 1, 2011.

2. The Registrar impose the following specified terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Sokol's certificate of registration:

a) Dr. Sokol shall, at his own expense, participate in and successfully complete an educational program in ethics approved by the College;

b) For a period of one year, the College may request information from the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (OHIP) and/or the Ministry of Health and Long Term Care in order for the College to monitor Dr. Sokol's OHIP billings and to ensure his compliance with the Health Insurance Act;

c) In order to facilitate the College's monitoring, specified in paragraph 2(b), Dr. Sokol shall execute a Consent in the form attached at Appendix "A" to this Order, and shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and patient charts by a College representative(s) for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order.

3. Dr. Sokol appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

4. Dr. Sokol pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00, within 30 days of the date of this Order. 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 16, 2011

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2013
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 01 Mar 2012
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 May 2013

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985