THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:22:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Health Care London
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6332
Fax: (519) 646-6334
Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
St Joseph's Healthcare
Rheumatology
F336-1
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
Phone: 905 522 1115
Extension: 37088
Fax: 905 521 8099

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 02 Dec 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Janet E. Pope Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pope (CPSO#: 55526 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Care London
D2 - 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6332

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Health Care London
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6332
Fax: (519) 646-6334
Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
St Joseph's Healthcare
Rheumatology
F336-1
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
Phone: 905 522 1115
Extension: 37088
Fax: 905 521 8099

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 02 Dec 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Janet E. Pope Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pope (CPSO#: 55526 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Care London
D2 - 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6332

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANET ELIZABETH POPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANET ELIZABETH POPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1985