THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:59:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 304 Victoria Avenue North
Suite 503
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 525-7907
Fax: (905) 525-9186

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 15 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anne M. Beattie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Beattie (CPSO#: 55538 )
Business Address: 304 Victoria Avenue North
Suite 503
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5G4
(905) 525-7907

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 304 Victoria Avenue North
Suite 503
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 525-7907
Fax: (905) 525-9186

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 15 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anne M. Beattie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Beattie (CPSO#: 55538 )
Business Address: 304 Victoria Avenue North
Suite 503
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5G4
(905) 525-7907

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE MAXINE BEATTIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEATTIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE MAXINE BEATTIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEATTIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1985